Global Patent Index - EP 1082327 A1

EP 1082327 A1 2001-03-14 - PERFLUORINATED ORGANO SUBSTITUTED CYCLOSILOXANES AND COPOLYMERS PREPARED FROM THESE CYCLOSILOXANES

Title (en)

PERFLUORINATED ORGANO SUBSTITUTED CYCLOSILOXANES AND COPOLYMERS PREPARED FROM THESE CYCLOSILOXANES

Title (de)

PERFLUORIERTE ORGANOSUBSTITUIERTE CYCLOSILOXANE UND AUS DIESEN CYCLOSILOXANEN HERGESTELLTE COPOLYMERE

Title (fr)

CYCLOSILOXANES A SUBSTITUTION ORGANO PERFLUORES ET COPOLYMERES PREPARES A PARTIR DESDITS CYCLOSILOXANES

Publication

EP 1082327 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908551 A

Priority

  • US 9904341 W
  • US 8664998 A
  • US 8718598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962916A1] Compositions of unstrained perfluorinated organo substituted cyclosiloxanes of formula (I) wherein m is an integer of 1 to 12; n is an integer of 1 to 4; X is a divalent radical which may include O, NH, N(CH3), OC(O), NHC(O), N(CH3)C(O)CH2; and R<F> is a perfluorinated straight chain or branched chain monovalent alkyl radical of 1 to 25 carbon atoms; or R<F> is a perfluorinated ether radical of general formula (II) wherein p is an integer of 1 to 10 are described, along with copolymer compositions prepared from these cyclopolysiloxanes and from mixtures of these cyclosiloxanes and other siloxanes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/08; C07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/21 (2006.01); C08G 77/04 (2006.01); C08G 77/24 (2006.01); C08G 77/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/21 (2013.01); C08G 77/045 (2013.01); C08G 77/24 (2013.01); C08G 77/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962916 A1 19991209; AU 2795599 A 19991220; CA 2342153 A1 19991209; EP 1082327 A1 20010314; EP 1082327 A4 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT LIFE SCIENCE MOLECULES (FLORIDA) INC.

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-04-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07F 7/08 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07F 7/10 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07F 7/21 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 77/04 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 77/24 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 77/46 B

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT LIFE SCIENCE MOLECULES (FLORIDA) INC.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI