Global patent index - EP 1082335 A1

EP 1082335 A1 2001-03-14 - NOVEL SECRETED AND MEMBRANE-ASSOCIATED PROTEINS AND USES THEREFOR

Title (en)

NOVEL SECRETED AND MEMBRANE-ASSOCIATED PROTEINS AND USES THEREFOR

Title (de)

NEUARTIGE SEKRETIERTE UND MEMBRANASSOZIIERTE PROTEINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES PROTEINES SECRETEES ET ASSOCIEES A UNE MEMBRANE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1082335 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924537 A

Priority

  • US 9911842 W
  • US 8689298 A
  • US 8712198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961463A1] Novel secreted and membrane-associated polypeptides, proteins, and nucleic acid molecules are disclosed (e.g., BDSF and STMST molecules). In addition to isolated, full-length proteins, the invention further provides isolated fusion proteins, antigenic peptides and antibodies. The invention also provides nucleic acid molecules, recombinant expression vectors containing a nucleic acid molecule of the invention, host cells into which the expression vectors have been introduced and non-human transgenic animals in which a BDSF or STMST gene has been introduced or disrupted. Diagnostic, screening and therapeutic methods utilizing compositions of the invention are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/435; C07K 16/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961463 A1 19991202; AU 4101599 A 19991213; CA 2328902 A1 19991202; EP 1082335 A1 20010314; EP 1082335 A4 20030305; JP 2002516079 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061214

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-03-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/85 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/86 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 1/21 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/435 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/00 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/10 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCARTHY, SEAN, A.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE