Global Patent Index - EP 1082395 A1

EP 1082395 A1 2001-03-14 - LIQUID DE-INKING COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYALKOXYLATED TERPENIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE FOR DE-INKING

Title (en)

LIQUID DE-INKING COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYALKOXYLATED TERPENIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE FOR DE-INKING

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGE ENTFÄRBUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUGEN AUF BASIS VON POLYALKOXYLIERTEN TERPENDERIVATEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON PAPIER

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS LIQUIDES DE DESENCRAGE A BASE DE COMPOSES TERPENIQUES POLYALKOXYLES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE DESENCRAGE DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 1082395 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915836 A

Priority

  • FR 9900983 W
  • FR 9805316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777898A1] Liquid de-inking composition comprises at least a surfactant of polyalkoxylated terpenic origin. Liquid de-inking composition comprises at least a surfactant of polyalkoxylated terpenic origin of formula (I): Z-X-W-(CH(R<5>)-CH(R<6>)-O)q-A (I); in which: Z = bicyclo(a,b,c)heptenyl or bicyclo(a,b,c)heptyl radical optionally substituted by at least one 1-6C alkyl radical, preferably methyl; a, b and c = such that: a + b + c = 5, a = 2, 3 or 4, b = 1 or 2 and c = 0 or 1; X = -CH2-C(R1)(R2)-O-; R1, R2 = 1-6C (cyclo)alkyl or (cyclo)alkenyl, notably methyl or preferably hydrogen; Alternatively, X = -O-CH(R'1)-CH(R'2)-O-; R'1, R'2 = 1-22C (cyclo)alkyl or (cyclo)alkenyl, or preferably hydrogen; one of R5 and R6 = H and the other = 1-22C (cyclo)alkyl or (cyclo)alkenyl, preferably methyl; q = 5-20; W = polysequence consisting of sequences (B)n and (C)p; B = -CH(R3)-CH(R4)-O-; R3 and R4 = 1-22C (cyclo)alkyl or (cyclo)alkenyl preferably methyl, being different if either are H; C = -CH2-CH2-O-; n = preferably 2-4; p = preferably 3-20; W = linked to X by a -(B)n sequence; A = H, 1-6C alkyl, aryl or alkylaryl, halogen, or -CH2-CH(OR7) R7 = 1-22C alkyl, or aryl, or a group selected from -SO3M, -OPO3(M)2, -(CH2)a-COOM, -(CH2)b-SO3M; a and b = 1-6; M = H, Na, Li, K or N(RR'RR')<+> R, R' = H or optionally hydroxylated 1-22C (cyclo)alkyl. Independent claims are also included for: (i) use of said composition as de-inker for paper; and (ii) 2-phase method for de-inking paper using said composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 9/04; D21C 5/02; B01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/00 (2006.01); B01F 17/42 (2006.01); C09D 9/04 (2006.01); D21C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/027 (2013.01); Y02W 30/648 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777898 A1 19991029; FR 2777898 B1 20000623; AU 3427699 A 19991116; AU 750386 B2 20020718; BR 9910007 A 20010116; CA 2330779 A1 19991104; EP 1082395 A1 20010314; HU 0101651 A2 20010928; HU 0101651 A3 20021028; JP 2002513093 A 20020508; PL 343764 A1 20010910; US 6440914 B1 20020827; WO 9955786 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DE-INKING PROCESS OF PAPER BASED ON POLYALKOXYLATED TERPENIC COMPOUNDS

2002-01-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DE-INKING PROCESS OF PAPER BASED ON POLYALKOXYLATED TERPENIC COMPOUNDS

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20001122;RO PAYMENT 20001122;SI PAYMENT 20001122