Global Patent Index - EP 1082406 A1

EP 1082406 A1 2001-03-14 - WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT SHAPED BODIES HAVING A CAVITY

Title (en)

WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT SHAPED BODIES HAVING A CAVITY

Title (de)

WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTELFORMKÖRPER MIT MULDE

Title (fr)

CORPS FA ONNES D'AGENT DE LAVAGE ET DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 1082406 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923598 A

Priority

  • DE 19822973 A
  • EP 9903335 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822973A1] The invention relates to washing and cleaning agent shaped bodies comprising a cavity, which are, however, mechanically stable and which can be produced on modern pelleting presses with high operational capacities. The inventive cleaning agent shaped bodies are obtained when the "relative ridge width" the quotient from the width of the distance from the margin of the cavity to the margin of the shaped body ("ridge width") and the width of the shaped body - is </=0.4. In particular, both the shaped bodies and the ridges, said ridges enclosing the cavity, exhibit these advantages. The shaped bodies comprising a cavity exhibit, for the most part, a substantial volumetric accuracy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; B01J 2/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 2/22 (2006.01); C11D 13/14 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822973 A1 19991202; AT 301704 T 20050815; CZ 20004393 A3 20010912; EP 1082406 A1 20010314; EP 1082406 B1 20050810; ES 2246571 T3 20060216; HU 0101872 A2 20011028; JP 2002516383 A 20020604; SK 17702000 A3 20010409; WO 9961574 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 301704

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-07-12 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 59912398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120712

2012-05-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-05-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-02-28 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 59912398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-02-28 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 59912398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-06-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20060510

2007-06-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-06-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-06-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2246571

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050810

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041105

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL