Global patent index - EP 1082420 A2

EP 1082420 A2 2001-03-14 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM NORMAL PANCREAS TISSUE

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM NORMAL PANCREAS TISSUE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN, DIE IN PANKREASNORMALGEWEBE ÜBEREXPRIMIERT SIND

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES HUMAINS PROVENANT DE TISSUS SAINS DU PANCREAS

Publication

EP 1082420 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99945722 A

Priority

  • DE 9901096 W
  • DE 19818598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818598A1] 38 specified nucleic acid (cDNA) sequences (A), all fully defined in the specification, that are highly expressed in normal pancreatic tissue, are new. Independent claims are also included for the following: (a) a subset (A') of 15 (A) that encode at least part of a gene product, the allelic variants of (A') and the complements of (A') or their allelic variants; (b) bacterial or phage artificial chromosomes and cosmid clones containing functional genes, or the chromosome region containing them, corresponding to (A') for use as gene transfer vehicles; (c) nucleic acid sequences containing part of (A) sufficiently long to hybridize with (A); (d) expression cassette (EC) comprising (A), or their fragments, plus control and regulatory sequences; (e) DNA fragments containing a gene isolated using (A); (f) host cells containing (A) as a heterologous component; (g) recombinant production of polypeptides (B), or their fragments, by culturing cells of (f); (h) antibody (Ab) directed against (B), or its fragments, encoded by (A); (j) 27 partial polypeptide sequences, fully defined in the specification, and sequences having at least 80% homology with them; (k) pharmaceutical composition containing at least one of these partial sequences; and (l) genomic genes, their promoters, enhancers, silencers, exon or intron structures, or splice variants obtained using (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954446A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818598 A1 19991021; EP 1082420 A2 20010314; JP 2002512022 A 20020423; WO 9954446 A2 19991028; WO 9954446 A3 20000602

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041102

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE