Global Patent Index - EP 1082425 A2

EP 1082425 A2 2001-03-14 - ION CHANNELS

Title (en)

ION CHANNELS

Title (de)

IONENKANÄLE

Title (fr)

CANAUX IONIQUES

Publication

EP 1082425 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99925184 A

Priority

  • GB 9901743 W
  • GB 9811965 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963081A2] The invention provides acid sensitive cation channel proteins which are capable of reversibly mediating (i) a rapid, and (ii) a sustained cation current, particularly the SPASIC protein or variants (e.g. homologues or fragments) thereof. Also provided are nucleic acids encoding these, or which have utility in probing, amplifying or down-regulating these. Methods of providing the proteins and nucleic acids are disclosed, as are vectors, host cells, and organisms utilising them, and antibodies. Also disclosed are methods of influencing the electrophysiological and/or pharmacological properties of a cell (e.g. by way of therapy) based on manipulation of the proteins or nucleic acids, and methods for screening for substances having ion-channel modulating activity (which may be potential analgesics; neuromodulatory agents; anti-inflammatory agents; agents that regulate neurotransmitter release or neuronal excitability).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A01K 67/027; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/85; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963081A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963081 A2 19991209; WO 9963081 A3 20000127; AU 4156799 A 19991220; EP 1082425 A2 20010314; GB 9811965 D0 19980729

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IONIX PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IONIX PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE