Global Patent Index - EP 1082447 A2

EP 1082447 A2 2001-03-14 - LENTIVIRAL VECTORS, COMPRISING MODIFIED MAJOR DONOR SPLICE SITES AND MAJOR PACKAGING SINGALS

Title (en)

LENTIVIRAL VECTORS, COMPRISING MODIFIED MAJOR DONOR SPLICE SITES AND MAJOR PACKAGING SINGALS

Title (de)

LENTIVIRALE VEKTOREN, MIT VERÄNDERTEN HAUPT-SPLEISS-DONOR STELLEN UND HAUPT-VERPACKUNGSSIGNALE

Title (fr)

VECTEURS LENTIVIRAUX

Publication

EP 1082447 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99957641 A

Priority

  • US 9911516 W
  • US 8663598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961598A2] Disclosed are lentiviral vector compositions and methods of use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/867 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16043 (2013.01); C12N 2830/003 (2013.01); C12N 2830/50 (2013.01); C12N 2840/203 (2013.01); C12N 2840/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000600A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961598 A2 19991202; WO 9961598 A3 20000413; AU 4207899 A 19991213; AU 4312699 A 20000117; AU 773015 B2 20040513; CA 2333481 A1 20000106; EP 1082447 A2 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVA SCIENCE PTE. LTD.

2008-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHANG, LUNG-JI

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030917

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001222;LT PAYMENT 20001222;LV PAYMENT 20001222;MK PAYMENT 20001222;RO PAYMENT 20001222;SI PAYMENT 20001222