Global patent index - EP 1082454 A1

EP 1082454 A1 2001-03-14 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITOR ANTIRETROVIRAL THERAPY

Title (en)

MEANS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING NON-NUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITOR ANTIRETROVIRAL THERAPY

Title (de)

GERÄTSCHAFT UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN VON ANTIRETROVIRALER THERAPIE DURCH NICHT-NUKLEOSIDISCHE REVERSE TRANSKRIPTASE INHIBITION

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET MOYENS DE SURVEILLANCE DE THERAPIE ANTIRETROVIRALE DES INHIBITEURS DE TRANSCRIPTASE INVERSE DES NON-NUCLEOSIDES

Publication

EP 1082454 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925874 A

Priority

  • US 9911629 W
  • US 8514898 A
  • US 12409099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961658A1] This invention relates to antiviral drug susceptibility and resistance tests to be used in identifying effective drug regimens for the treatment of human immunodificiency virus (HIV) infection and acquired immunodeficiency syndrome (AIDS) and further relates to the means and methods of monitoring the clinical progression of HIV infection and its response to antiretroviral therapy, particularly non-nucleoside reverse transcriptase inhibitor therapy using phenotypic susceptibility assays or genotypic assays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/66; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/64; C12N 15/85; C12P 19/34; C12Q 1/68; C12Q 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/703 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961658 A1 19991202; AU 4207599 A 19991213; AU 772511 B2 20040429; BR 9911600 A 20010213; CA 2329140 A1 19991202; CN 1204266 C 20050601; CN 1311823 A 20010905; CN 1532290 A 20040929; EP 1082454 A1 20010314; EP 1082454 A4 20050413; JP 2002516119 A 20020604; MX PA00011623 A 20021017; NZ 508834 A 20040625

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081203

2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1036825

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20051020

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONOGRAM BIOSCIENCES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-04-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050228

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WHITCOMB, JEANNETTE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE