Global patent index - EP 1082459 A1

EP 1082459 A1 2001-03-14 - A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING LUNG CANCER

Title (en)

A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING LUNG CANCER

Title (de)

NEUE METHODE ZUR DIAGNOSE, ÜBERWACHUNG UND BESTIMMUNG DES STADIUMS VON LUNGENKREBS

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE DE DIAGNOSTIC, DE SUIVI ET DE STADIFICATION DU CANCER DU POUMON

Publication

EP 1082459 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921894 A

Priority

  • US 9910344 W
  • US 8621298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960160A1] The present invention provides a new method for detecting, diagnosing, monitoring, staging, and prognosticating lung cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57423 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960160 A1 19991125; CA 2328138 A1 19991125; EP 1082459 A1 20010314; EP 1082459 A4 20020925; JP 2002515262 A 20020528; JP 3688585 B2 20050831

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050504

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7G 01N 33/72 B, 7G 01N 33/574 B

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE