Global Patent Index - EP 1082459 A4

EP 1082459 A4 2002-09-25 - A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING LUNG CANCER

Title (en)

A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING LUNG CANCER

Title (de)

NEUE METHODE ZUR DIAGNOSE, ÜBERWACHUNG UND BESTIMMUNG DES STADIUMS VON LUNGENKREBS

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE DE DIAGNOSTIC, DE SUIVI ET DE STADIFICATION DU CANCER DU POUMON

Publication

EP 1082459 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99921894 A

Priority

  • US 9910344 W
  • US 8621298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960160A1] The present invention provides a new method for detecting, diagnosing, monitoring, staging, and prognosticating lung cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/574; G01N 33/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57423 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9639419 A1 19961212 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [Y] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] March 1998 (1998-03-01), WANG Z ET AL: "[Expression and prognostic relation of cathepsin D in non-small cell lung cancer tissues and lymph nodes]", XP002206076, Database accession no. NLM11263354 & ZHONGHUA JIE HE HE HU XI ZA ZHI = CHINESE JOURNAL OF TUBERCULOSIS AND RESPIRATORY DISEASES. CHINA MAR 1998, vol. 21, no. 3, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 164 - 166, ISSN: 1001-0939ZHONGHUA JIE HE HE HU XI ZA ZHI = CHINESE JOURNAL OF TUBERCULOSIS AND RESPIRATORY DISEASES. CHINA MAR 19981998032131001-0939164166
  • See also references of WO 9960160A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960160 A1 19991125; CA 2328138 A1 19991125; EP 1082459 A1 20010314; EP 1082459 A4 20020925; JP 2002515262 A 20020528; JP 3688585 B2 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050504

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7G 01N 33/72 B, 7G 01N 33/574 B

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE