Global Patent Index - EP 1082460 A1

EP 1082460 A1 2001-03-14 - A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING PROSTATE CANCER

Title (en)

A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, AND STAGING PROSTATE CANCER

Title (de)

NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE, ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND VERLAUFSBEOBACHTUNG VON PROSTATAKREBS

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC, DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE STADIFICATION DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE

Publication

EP 1082460 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921946 A

Priority

  • US 9910548 W
  • US 8626598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960162A1] The present invention provides a new method for detecting, diagnosing, monitoring, staging and prognosticating prostate cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57434 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960162 A1 19991125; CA 2328377 A1 19991125; EP 1082460 A1 20010314; EP 1082460 A4 20030212; JP 2002515263 A 20020528; JP 3677210 B2 20050727

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-02-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 A

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/574 B

2003-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/567 B

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE