Global Patent Index - EP 1082475 A1

EP 1082475 A1 2001-03-14 - TWISTING DISK AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

TWISTING DISK AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

DRALLSCHEIBE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DRALLSCHEIBE

Title (fr)

DISQUE DE TORSION ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN DISQUE DE TORSION

Publication

EP 1082475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910077 A

Priority

  • CH 9900141 W
  • DE 19815578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815578C1] The friction disk (1), for false twisting textile yarns (4,6), has a tire (8) as the peripheral rounded friction surface (7). The tire is of a compound material, with an aramide filling, or a filling based on other plastics with high temp. resistance. The high temp. resistance component of the compound material is in a concentration of 1-50%. The proportion of high temp. resistance materials is pref. 2-20%. The peripheral tire (8) has a thin wall, with a wall thickness of at least 1-3 mm. The tire (8) has a constant thickness all round. The tire (8) is fitted to the hub (9) as a cap, in a force fit bond. The disk hub (9) has a support ring, with a shape close to the outer friction surface (7) of the tire (8), encapsulated by the tire (8). The hub (9) is injection molded, with a number of spokes for the bonded support ring, enclosed by the compound material, or the spoke structure is bonded to a number of support bodies enclosed in the compound material. The tire (8) is injection molded, using a thermoplastic material with an aramide filling. An Independent claim is included for a false twisting disk prodn. process using a disk with a peripheral tire (8) of a polyurethane based on para-phenylenediisocyanate (PPDI) using polycarbonate and polyethercarbonatediolene and their mixtures, shaped in a high pressure injection molding process. Preferred Features: The hub (9) is of a special modified hard thermoplastic and pref. hard thermoplastic polyurethane (TPU) with a glass fiber content of \-10%. The molded hub (9) is placed in the mold, for the tire (8) to be injection molded round it in a second stage. The molded disk structure (1) is ground for balancing to give true running. The friction disk (1) can be molded in a single stage, with two or more mold sections forming a single mold. At least the materials of the tire and the hub are colored for quality marking, with pref. orange for the hub material and a lighter color for the tire such as yellow, green or gray, or even red or blue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/92 (2006.01); D02G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/923 (2013.01); D02G 1/082 (2013.01); D02G 1/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951803A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815578 C1 19990826; AU 2919399 A 19991025; EP 1082475 A1 20010314; EP 1082475 B1 20020828; TW 459077 B 20011011; WO 9951803 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020828

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902473 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE