Global Patent Index - EP 1082476 A1

EP 1082476 A1 2001-03-14 - FRICTIONAL TWISTING DEVICE

Title (en)

FRICTIONAL TWISTING DEVICE

Title (de)

FRIKTIONSDRALLVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TORSION PAR FRICTION

Publication

EP 1082476 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926236 A

Priority

  • DE 9901021 W
  • DE 19814921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814921A1] The invention relates to a frictional twisting device for texturing synthetic filament yarns, comprising several adjacent, parallel, rotating shafts with at least one friction disk disposed on each shaft. The friction disks are offset against each other and are axially arranged on the shafts at a mutual distance, whereby the intersecting circumferential arcs of said disks, when seen from an axial overhead position, form a common overlap area in which an overlapping circle tangent to the inside of the circumferential arc can be placed, whereby the thread running through the frictional twisting device forms a type of helix with an angle of inclination alpha ranging from 38 DEG to 41 DEG . The invention also relates to a method for determining the individual parameters of the frictional twisting device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/08; D01H 7/92; D02G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/082 (2013.01); D02G 1/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951804A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814921 A1 19991007; DE 19980597 D2 20010621; EP 1082476 A1 20010314; EP 1082476 B1 20040818; WO 9951804 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-07-17 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910289 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2004-08-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMCO TEXTILMASCHINENKOMPONENTEN GMBH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI