Global patent index - EP 1082481 A1

EP 1082481 A1 2001-03-14 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING A TREATMENT MEDIUM TO A MOVING STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR APPLYING A TREATMENT MEDIUM TO A MOVING STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES BEHANDLUNGSMITTELS AUF EINE LAUFENDE WARENBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UN AGENT DE TRAITEMENT SUR UNE BANDE PRODUIT DEFILANTE

Publication

EP 1082481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919150 A

Priority

  • DE 29808981 U
  • EP 9902116 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6321426B1] The device (100) is used to apply a treatment medium to a moving strip of material (W) e.g. a dyebath to a strip of carpet. The device (100) is composed of a rigid support (3) that is securely arranged in a machine frame (1) and extends in a perpendicular position with respect to the strip of material, an inflatable pressure cushion (12) extending along the support (3), a less rigid supporting beam (13) arranged on the pressure cushion (12) with ends that are mounted in an articulating manner on the machine frame (1) around axes (22, 22) that are parallel to the strip of material, in addition to an application beam (25) placed on the supporting beam (13) in perpendicular position with respect to the strip of material (W) and running parallel to the surfaces thereof, whereby the application beam rests upon the strip of material (W) with the aid of a sliding surface. An application slit (30) that opens out onto the sliding surface (35) in placed in the vicinity thereof. Feed pipes for the treatment medium are arranged along the length of the application slit (30) and lead thereto. A support roller (10), running parallel to the application slot (30) and located opposite thereto, and a device that engages with the support roller (10) to adjust the gap (40) between the support roller (10) and the application beam (25) are provided on the other side of the strip of material (W).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); D06B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29808981 U1 19990930; DK 1082481 T3 20021014; EP 1082481 A1 20010314; EP 1082481 B1 20020626; JP 2002515554 A 20020528; JP 3590352 B2 20041117; US 6321426 B1 20011127; WO 9960195 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EDUARD *KUSTERS MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901869

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-01

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR IT LI