Global patent index - EP 1082493 A1

EP 1082493 A1 2001-03-14 - PAPERMAKING PROCESS UTILIZING HYDROPHILIC DISPERSION POLYMERS OF DIALLYLDIMETHYL AMMONIUM CHLORIDE AND ACRYLAMIDE AS RETENTION AND DRAINAGE AIDS

Title (en)

PAPERMAKING PROCESS UTILIZING HYDROPHILIC DISPERSION POLYMERS OF DIALLYLDIMETHYL AMMONIUM CHLORIDE AND ACRYLAMIDE AS RETENTION AND DRAINAGE AIDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG MITTELS RETENTIONS- UND ENTWÄSSERUNGSHILFSMITTELS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER UTILISANT DES POLYMERES A DISPERSION HYDROPHILE DE CHLORURE D'AMMONIUM DIALLYLDIMETHYLE ET D'ACRYLAMIDE COMME AUXILIAIRES DE RETENTION ET D'EGOUTTAGE

Publication

EP 1082493 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903105 A

Priority

US 9900869 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042253A1] A method for improving retention and drainage performance in a papermaking process is disclosed. The method comprises forming an aqueous cellulosic papermaking slurry, adding an effective amount of a hydrophilic dispersion polymer to the slurry, draining the slurry to form a sheet and drying the sheet. The hydrophilic dispersion polymer is preferably a copolymer of diallyldimethyl ammonium chloride and acrylamide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/45; D21H 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/66 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

D21H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/45 (2013.01); D21H 17/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042253 A1 20000720; AU 2320899 A 20000801; AU 766846 B2 20031023; BR 9908576 A 20001121; BR 9908576 B1 20090113; CN 1189623 C 20050216; CN 1289380 A 20010328; DE 69924371 D1 20050428; DE 69924371 T2 20050915; DK 1082493 T3 20050425; EP 1082493 A1 20010314; EP 1082493 A4 20020605; EP 1082493 B1 20050323; NO 20003678 A 20000912; NO 20003678 D0 20000718; NO 326100 B1 20080922

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69924371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69924371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2237082

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69924371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-04-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-06-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE