Global Patent Index - EP 1082504 A1

EP 1082504 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATING WITH DECORATIVE PATTERNS, MINERAL COATING AND TOOLS FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATING WITH DECORATIVE PATTERNS, MINERAL COATING AND TOOLS FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERZIERTEN VERPUTZES, MINERALISCHER VERPUTZ UND WERKZEUGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES VERZIERTEN VERPUTZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'ENDUIT A MOTIFS DECORATIFS, ENDUIT MINERAL ET OUTILS PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1082504 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915860 A

Priority

  • FR 9901009 W
  • FR 9805331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777829A1] A method for producing a coating with decorative patterns is characterized in that it comprises the following steps: (a) a first step in which a coating layer is deposited on the surface to be coated; (b) a second step in which patterns are quasi-instantaneously formed on the fresh and still malleable coating layer.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - INDEPENDENT CLAIMS are also included for - (1) the mineral coating that allows this method to be put into service; and - (2) tools that are used in the method

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/04; B28B 7/00; B44C 1/24; B44F 9/04; C04B 28/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44B 5/02 (2006.01); B44C 1/24 (2006.01); B44F 9/04 (2006.01); E04F 21/04 (2006.01); E04F 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44B 5/026 (2013.01); B44C 1/24 (2013.01); B44F 9/04 (2013.01); E04F 21/04 (2013.01); E04F 21/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955987A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777829 A1 19991029; FR 2777829 B1 20000721; AT 318355 T 20060315; BR 9910028 A 20001226; CN 1108934 C 20030521; CN 1303456 A 20010711; DE 69929962 D1 20060427; DE 69929962 T2 20061123; EP 1082504 A1 20010314; EP 1082504 B1 20060222; HU 0101648 A2 20010928; HU 0101648 A3 20070828; TR 200100154 T2 20010521; WO 9955987 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130428

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130428

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130428

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN WEBER

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090609

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060523

2007-03-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-06-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060602

2006-05-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929962 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2003-12-03 [R11L] GRANTING OF A LICENCE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 0100 SOCIETE LISTEL FACADE

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-12-03 [R11L] GRANTING OF A LICENCE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 0200 LISTED FACADE SARL

- Effective date: 20010709

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN WEBER

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOURON, CLAUDE

2001-09-26 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 20010709 0100 WEBER ET BROUTIN FRANCE, SOCIETE ANONYME * 20010709 0200 LISTED FACADE SARL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE