Global Patent Index - EP 1082509 A1

EP 1082509 A1 2001-03-14 - ANTI-THEFT ARRANGEMENT IN A VEHICLE DOOR

Title (en)

ANTI-THEFT ARRANGEMENT IN A VEHICLE DOOR

Title (de)

ANTI-DIEBSTAHL SYSTEM FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGTÜR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ANTI-VOL D'UNE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1082509 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930027 A

Priority

  • SE 9900901 W
  • SE 9801876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961736A1] A vehicle door (12) provided with an anti-theft arrangement (10). The vehicle door has an outer door skin (14) and an inner door skin (16) defining a door cavity (18) therebetween in which a door lock assembly is mounted. The outer door skin (14) and the inner door skin (16) are spaced from each other along an upper edge of the door to thereby define a window glass opening (22) to the door cavity (18) through which a window glass (24) can be raised and lowered. The door cavity (18) further houses an anti-theft arrangement (10) having a cover (26) shielding the door lock assembly. The cover has a major extension substantially in a principal plane, the cover further having an upper edge region (30), an adjacent side edge region (32) and at least one further edge region (34) to thereby form a peripheral boundary of the cover (26). The upper edge region (30) presents a flange section (36) and the cover (26) is mounted in said door cavity (18) such that the flange section (36) lies adjacent the window glass opening (22) and extends substantially parallel to the opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961736A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961736 A1 19991202; DE 69914899 D1 20040325; DE 69914899 T2 20050105; EP 1082509 A1 20010314; EP 1082509 B1 20040218; SE 514191 C2 20010122; SE 9801876 D0 19980527; SE 9801876 L 19991128

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040527

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914899 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB