Global Patent Index - EP 1082531 A1

EP 1082531 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VALVE LIFT DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VALVE LIFT DEVICE

Title (de)

STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE VENTILHUBEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE LEVEE DE SOUPAPES

Publication

EP 1082531 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99926449 A

Priority

  • EP 9903685 W
  • FR 9806791 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779182A1] The invention concerns a method for controlling a valve lift device, associated with an internal combustion engine. Said method is characterised in that it consists in: (a) determining the angular offset reference value alpha 0 when the valve lift device is inactivated, each time the engine moves into stabilised idle speed and taking it into account for subsequent angular offset control; and it further consists of at least one of the following steps: (b) prior test stand mapping on an opening cycle ratio (RCO) of a hydraulic valve controlled valve lift device PID based on the engine water temperature, and adjusting the angular offset to be applied (by modifying the reference value alpha 0 according to said water temperature; (c) determining the difference between the applied (RCO) control and the control computed at step (b) by observing term I of the valve lift control PID and by storing its value in an adaptive term; (d) determining the valve lift response time following a predetermined control level and on the basis of said response time, modifying the proportional term P of the PID; (e) verifying that the angular offset between the camshaft and the crankshaft does not oscillate when the set value is stable, and consequently modifying the term P of the PID to prevent said oscillation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2013.01); F02D 41/2496 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779182 A1 19991203; FR 2779182 B1 20000825; DE 69902659 D1 20021002; DE 69902659 T2 20030109; EP 1082531 A1 20010314; EP 1082531 B1 20020828; ES 2182533 T3 20030301; US 6397799 B1 20020604; WO 9963213 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182533 T3

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902659 20021002

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S.

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT