Global Patent Index - EP 1082540 A2

EP 1082540 A2 2001-03-14 - MAGNETIC FLUX SHAPING IN ION ACCELERATORS WITH CLOSED ELECTRON DRIFT

Title (en)

MAGNETIC FLUX SHAPING IN ION ACCELERATORS WITH CLOSED ELECTRON DRIFT

Title (de)

MAGNETFELDGESTALTUNG IN IONEBESCHLEUNIGERN MIT GESCHLOSSENER ELEKTRONENLAUFBAHN

Title (fr)

MISE EN FORME DU FLUX MAGNETIQUE DANS DES ACCELERATEURS D'IONS A COURANT D'ELECTRONS FERME

Publication

EP 1082540 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99931754 A

Priority

  • US 9912402 W
  • US 8816498 P
  • US 9226998 P
  • US 19174998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963221A2] A specially designed magnetic shunt is provided encircling the anode region and/or annular gas distribution area of an ion accelerator with closed electron drift. The magnetic shunt is constructed to concentrate the magnetic field at the ion exit end, such that the location of maximum magnetic field strength is located downstream from the inner and outer magnetic poles of the accelerator. The specially designed shunt also results in desired curvatures of magnetic field lines upstream of the line of maximum magnetic field strength, to achieve a focusing effect for increasing the life and efficiency of accelerator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963221A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963221 A2 19991209; WO 9963221 A3 20000224; AU 4818699 A 19991220; DE 69902589 D1 20020926; DE 69902589 T2 20030522; EP 1082540 A2 20010314; EP 1082540 B1 20020821; IL 139487 A 20040219; IL 139487 D0 20011125; JP 2002517661 A 20020618; JP 4294867 B2 20090715

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: KSNH PATENTANWAELTE KLUNKER/SCHMITT-NILSON/HIR, DE

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., REDMOND, US

- Document: DE 69902589

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., RANCHO CORDOVA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., REDMOND, WASH., US

- Document: DE 69902589

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: GULDE & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZL, DE

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: KSNH PATENTANWAELTE KLUNKER/SCHMITT-NILSON/HIR, DE

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-05-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140417

2014-05-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC.

- Effective date: 20140417

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEROJET-GENERAL CORP., REDMOND, US

- Document: DE 69902589

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEROJET ROCKETDYNE, INC., RANCHO CORDOVA, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AEROJET-GENERAL CORP., REDMOND, WASH., US

- Document: DE 69902589

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: GULDE HENGELHAUPT ZIEBIG & SCHNEIDER, DE

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: GULDE & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZL, DE

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: KSNH PATENTANWAELTE KLUNKER/SCHMITT-NILSON/HIR, DE

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-02-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902589

- Representative's name: GULDE HENGELHAUPT ZIEBIG & SCHNEIDER, DE

2003-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

2003-04-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902589 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL DYNAMICS OTS (AEROSPACE), INC.

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT