Global patent index - EP 1082560 A2

EP 1082560 A2 2001-03-14 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A SAFETY VALVE

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A SAFETY VALVE

Title (de)

STEUEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SICHERHEITSVENTIL

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COMMANDE POUR UNE SOUPAPE DE SURETE

Publication

EP 1082560 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99936331 A

Priority

  • DE 9901560 W
  • DE 19824494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824494C1] The invention relates to a control device (10) wherein a control member (14) can be triggered by a pressure-displacement transducer (12) to control the safety valve (4) of a pressurized container (1). An area (28; 303) of the pressure-displacement transducer can be connected to a blow-off tank (92) by means of a drainage line (90). A first embodiment is characterized by a shift valve device (100) that is associated with said drainage line (90) and which connects the area (28) to a discharge line (102) as opposed to the blow-off tank (92) when the pressure in the blow-off tank rises above a specific pressure limit. A second embodiment has a hydraulic compensation system (200) which exerts a first force on the pressure-displacement transducer (12) from pressure inside the blow-off tank (92), whereby said first force acts against a second force produced by the pressure in the area (28; 33) and compensates said second force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 17/10 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0426 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7762 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7769 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963250A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824494 C1 19990819; EP 1082560 A2 20010314; EP 1082560 B1 20020925; JP 2002517680 A 20020618; JP 3693917 B2 20050914; RU 2215223 C2 20031027; US 2001006078 A1 20010705; US 6386228 B2 20020514; WO 9963250 A2 19991209; WO 9963250 A3 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AREVA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59902852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-08-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AREVA NP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE