Global Patent Index - EP 1082575 A1

EP 1082575 A1 2001-03-14 - REGULATING DEVICE FOR A GAS BURNER

Title (en)

REGULATING DEVICE FOR A GAS BURNER

Title (de)

REGELEINRICHTUNG FÜR GASBRENNER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGULATION POUR BRULEUR A GAZ

Publication

EP 1082575 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927777 A

Priority

  • DE 19824524 A
  • EP 9903671 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963273A1] Regulating devices for gas burners are used to provide a gas/air mixture for a burner. Regulating devices are also known which have a variable transmission ratio between gas pressure and combustion air pressure or gas flow and combustion air flow. The required measurement of pressure in all known regulating devices is carried out pneumatically. The inventive regulating device has a sensor (19) that generates an electrical or electronic signal (22) and that is arranged between a first line guiding the gas flow and a second line (14) guiding a combustion air flow. The regulating device is also fitted with a summation device (26) that calculates the electrical or electronic signal (22) of the sensor (19) using an auxiliary signal (27). A regulating signal (24) generated from an output signal (30) of the summation device (26) is used to alter the gas flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/02; F23N 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01); F23N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/184 (2013.01); F23N 3/082 (2013.01); F23N 2025/02 (2013.01); F23N 2025/04 (2013.01); F23N 2033/08 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963273A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963273 A1 19991209; CA 2334383 A1 19991209; DE 19824524 C1 20000203; DE 19824524 C2 20020808; DK 1082575 T3 20030623; EP 1082575 A1 20010314; EP 1082575 B1 20030129; ES 2187166 T3 20030516; JP 2002517703 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL

- Effective date: 20080618

2008-07-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2004-06-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187166 T3

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904166 P 20030306

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020628

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE