Global Patent Index - EP 1082611 A1

EP 1082611 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR STAINING BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS BY COMBINING UNSTABLE REAGENTS ON A MICROSCOPE SLIDE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STAINING BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS BY COMBINING UNSTABLE REAGENTS ON A MICROSCOPE SLIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANFÄRBEN BIOLOGISCHER PROBEN DURCH KOMBINATION INSTABILER REAGENZIEN AUF OBJEKTTRÄGERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE COLORATION D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES PAR COMBINAISON DE REACTIFS INSTABLES SUR LAME PORTE-OBJET

Publication

EP 1082611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955323 A

Priority

  • US 9912263 W
  • US 8767398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963342A1] The present invention relates to automated methods for staining biolocal materials on a slide comprising the use of component histochemical solutions mixed directly on a biological sample of interest. The method comprises providing at least two stable solutions that together comprise an unstable staining solution, sequentially delivering the stable solutions to a biological sample of interst on a surface, and mixing the stable solutions directly on the biological material of interest to effectuate staining of the material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/483; G01N 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); G01N 1/30 (2006.01); G01N 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963342 A1 19991209; EP 1082611 A1 20010314; EP 1082611 A4 20030115; JP 2002517725 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051122

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050510

2003-01-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021128

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 33/483 A, 7G 01N 35/00 B, 7G 01N 1/30 B, 7G 01N 1/31 B

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VENTANA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB