Global patent index - EP 1082622 A1

EP 1082622 A1 2001-03-14 - DIRECTIONAL OBJECT SENSOR FOR AUTOMATIC FLOW CONTROLLER

Title (en)

DIRECTIONAL OBJECT SENSOR FOR AUTOMATIC FLOW CONTROLLER

Title (de)

RICHTUNGS-OBJEKTSENSOR FÜR AUTOMATISCHEN DURCHFLUSSMENGENREGLER

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DIRECTIONNEL D'OBJET POUR UNITE DE COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE D'ECOULEMENT

Publication

EP 1082622 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924291 A

Priority

  • US 9910878 W
  • US 8574098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961938A1] In response to an infrared-radiation sensor assembly (12), a control circuit controls an electromechanical valve (18) in an automatic faucet (16). Reflector surfaces (44, 46) so form a sensor beam as to cause the sensor to be insensitive to the presence of a sink (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 17/02; E03C 1/05; G01S 7/481

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/05 (2006.01); G01S 7/481 (2006.01); G01S 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/057 (2013.01); G01S 7/4811 (2013.01); G01S 7/4813 (2013.01); G01S 17/026 (2013.01); G01S 7/4818 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961938A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961938 A1 19991202; CA 2333285 A1 19991202; DE 69927150 D1 20051013; DE 69927150 T2 20060622; EP 1082622 A1 20010314; EP 1082622 B1 20050907; JP 2002517002 A 20020611; US 6127671 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69927150

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120517

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2006-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060608

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69927150

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI