Global Patent Index - EP 1082636 A1

EP 1082636 A1 2001-03-14 - CONTACT LENSES WITH CONTOURED EDGES

Title (en)

CONTACT LENSES WITH CONTOURED EDGES

Title (de)

KONTAKTLINSE MIT PROFILIERTEN RÄNDERN

Title (fr)

LENTILLES DE CONTACT AUX BORDS PROFILES

Publication

EP 1082636 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00910304 A

Priority

  • US 0004635 W
  • US 27586699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0058773A1] The invention provides contact lenses with contoured lens edges. The contoured lens edges of the invention form a substantially smooth curve (21). The lens edge comprises the area beginning at the periphery (18) of the optic zone (11) and ending at the outermost point (19) of the lens. The use of the contoured lens edge eliminates the need for one or more of a lenticular zone, bevel, side wall, or other zones found in a conventional contact lens to facilitate lens handling and comfort. The invention provides also a method for designing a contact lens comprising, consisting essentially of, and consisting of: a) designing an optic zone for a first lens surface; b) selecting an x and a y coordinate for each of at least two points on the first lens surface; and c) fitting a curve through the points specified in step b) to form a contoured lens edge, the contoured lens edge being a substantially smooth curve having a functional form selected from a group consisting of a polynomial, a ratio of two polynomials, a trigonometric function, a parametric function, a spline, a conic section, and combinations thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/04 (2006.01); G02C 7/06 (2006.01); G02C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0058773A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058773 A1 20001005; AR 031065 A1 20030910; AU 3241800 A 20001016; BR 0005568 A 20010306; CA 2332330 A1 20001005; CA 2332330 C 20100727; CN 1297538 A 20010530; EP 1082636 A1 20010314; JP 2002540468 A 20021126; TW 487815 B 20020521; US 6206520 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032447

2004-09-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE