Global Patent Index - EP 1082714 A1

EP 1082714 A1 2001-03-14 - ILLUMINATED INDICATION DEVICE FOR ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (en)

ILLUMINATED INDICATION DEVICE FOR ROAD TRAFFIC

Title (de)

LEUCHTANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN STRASSENVERKEHR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SIGNALISATION LUMINEUSE POUR LA CIRCULATION ROUTIERE

Publication

EP 1082714 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919231 A

Priority

  • DE 19824425 A
  • EP 9902506 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824425A1] The invention relates to an illuminated indication device for road traffic. A number of indicating points are formed with indicating lenses (1) in or on an indicating surface. Said indicating lenses have a light entry surface (9) and a light exit surface (8) and are illuminated by the rear face of the indicating surface, which consists of individually allocated light-emitting elements with a small diameter. The aim of the invention is to make the indication device easier to read. To this end, the light entry surface (9) and/or the light exit surface (8) is/are shaped in such a way that the distribution of light intensity on the indicator surface extends further in a horizontal direction than in a vertical direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/04; G09F 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01); G09F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2013.01); G09F 13/04 (2013.01); G09F 13/00 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0459 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0472 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0481 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963510A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824425 A1 19991209; BR 9910841 A 20010220; CA 2333500 A1 19991209; EP 1082714 A1 20010314; EP 1082714 B1 20020313; US 6419376 B1 20020716; WO 9963510 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900986 20020418

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2002-03-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010102

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL