Global Patent Index - EP 1082733 A1

EP 1082733 A1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A MAGNETIC MATERIAL BY FORGING AND MAGNETIC MATERIAL IN POWDER FORM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING A MAGNETIC MATERIAL BY FORGING AND MAGNETIC MATERIAL IN POWDER FORM

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN MAGNETMATERIAL DURCH SCHMIEDEN UND MAGNETMATERIAL IN PULVERFORM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN MATERIAU MAGNETIQUE PAR FORGEAGE ET MATERIAU MAGNETIQUE SOUS FORME DE POUDRE

Publication

EP 1082733 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922227 A

Priority

  • FR 9901234 W
  • FR 9806745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779267A1] The invention concerns a method for preparing a magnetic material by forging, characterised in that, in a first embodiment, it comprises the following steps: placing in a sheath an alloy based on at least one rare earth, at least one transition metal and at least one other element selected among boron and carbon; bringing the whole alloy to a temperature not less than 500 DEG C; forging the whole at a deformation speed of the material not less than 8s<-1>. After forging, it is possible to subject the resulting product to at least one annealing and hydridation then dehydridation. In another embodiment, it consists in starting with an alloy based on at least one rare earth and one transition metal and proceeding as in the first embodiment. After forging and, optionally, annealing, hydridation and dehydridation treatments, the resulting material is subjected to nitriding. The invention also concerns a magnetic material in powder form, characterised in that it has a coercivity not less than 9kOe and retentivity not less than 9kG.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/057; H01F 1/058; H01F 1/059; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/053 (2006.01); H01F 1/057 (2006.01); H01F 1/058 (2006.01); H01F 1/059 (2006.01); H01F 1/06 (2006.01); H01F 1/08 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0576 (2013.01); H01F 1/058 (2013.01); H01F 1/059 (2013.01); H01F 41/0273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779267 A1 19991203; FR 2779267 B1 20000811; AT 236450 T 20030415; AU 3935399 A 19991213; CN 1142562 C 20040317; CN 1310849 A 20010829; DE 69906513 D1 20030508; DE 69906513 T2 20040219; EP 1082733 A1 20010314; EP 1082733 B1 20030402; JP 2002516925 A 20020611; JP 3668134 B2 20050706; TW 558469 B 20031021; US 6592682 B1 20030715; WO 9962080 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070526

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906513 P 20030508

2003-04-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SANTOKU CORPORATION

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANTOKU AMERICA, INC.

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB