Global Patent Index - EP 1082737 A1

EP 1082737 A1 2001-03-14 - SAFETY ISOLATING TRANSFORMER

Title (en)

SAFETY ISOLATING TRANSFORMER

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSTRENNTRANSFORMATOR

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR D'ISOLEMENT DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1082737 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925134 A

Priority

  • GB 9901492 W
  • GB 9811545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963556A1] The present invention relates to a miniature safety isolating transformer (30), and in particular to a telephone line matching transformer suitable for bi-directional data transfer up to at least 56 kbps. The miniature safety isolating transformer (30), comprises a magnetic core (2) and a first winding (34) and a second winding (35) separated and electrically insulated by solid insulating means (29, 39) from each other and the core (2), in which a minimum of a separation (38) between the windings and a separation (28, 36, 37) from the first winding (34) to the core (2) defines a safety isolating distance (28, 36, 37, 38), the separation (31, 32, 33) from the second winding (35) to the core (2) being less than said safety isolating distance (28, 36, 37, 38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32; H01F 5/02; H01F 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 5/02 (2006.01); H01F 19/08 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 5/02 (2013.01); H01F 19/08 (2013.01); H01F 27/324 (2013.01); H01F 2019/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963556A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963556 A1 19991209; AU 4152699 A 19991220; AU 752951 B2 20021003; CN 1220995 C 20050928; CN 1302443 A 20010704; DE 69915058 D1 20040401; DE 69915058 T2 20041021; EP 1082737 A1 20010314; EP 1082737 B1 20040225; GB 2339338 A 20000119; GB 9811545 D0 19980729

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031269

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915058 P 20040401

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE