Global Patent Index - EP 1082753 A1

EP 1082753 A1 2001-03-14 - LAMP FOR GENERATING HIGH POWER ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION

Title (en)

LAMP FOR GENERATING HIGH POWER ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION

Title (de)

LAMPE ZUR EMISSSION VON ULTRAVIOLETTSTRAHLUNG MIT HOHER LEISTUNG

Title (fr)

LAMPE EMETTANT UN RAYONNEMENT ULTRAVIOLET DE GRANDE PUISSANCE

Publication

EP 1082753 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924877 A

Priority

US 9810611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962104A1] The apparatus is a gas filled ultraviolet generating lamp (10) for use as a liquid purifier. The lamp (10) is powered by high voltage AC, but has no metallic electrode within or in contact with the gas enclosure which is constructed as two concentric quartz cylinders (16, 20) sealed together at their ends, with the gas fill between the cylinders. Cooling liquid is pumped through the volume (14) inside the inner quartz cylinder (16), where an electrically conductive pipe (12) spaced from the inner cylinder (16) is used to supply the cooling liquid and act as the high voltage electrode. The gas enclosure (18) is enclosed within but spaced from a metal housing (28) which is connected to operate as the ground electrode of the circuit and through which the treated fluid flows. Thus, the electrical circuit is from the central pipe (12), and through the cooling liquid, the gas enclosure (18), the treated liquid on the outside of the outer quartz cylinder (20), and to the housing (28). The high voltage electrode (12) is electrically isolated from the source of cooling liquid by a length of insulated hose which also supplies the cooling liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/046 (2013.01); H01J 61/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962104A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962104 A1 19991202; WO 9962104 A8 20010816; AT 289117 T 20050215; AU 2806101 A 20010305; AU 767717 B2 20031120; CA 2333106 A1 19991202; CA 2333106 C 20070313; DE 69829004 D1 20050317; DE 69829004 T2 20060112; DK 1082753 T3 20050613; EP 1082753 A1 20010314; EP 1082753 B1 20050209; ES 2238761 T3 20050901; JP 2002517072 A 20020611; JP 4159745 B2 20081001

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130527

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140610

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69829004

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-02-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-02-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130527

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRITON THALASSIC TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRITON THALASSIC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Free text: TRITON THALASSIC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.#241 ETHAN ALLEN HIGHWAY#RIDGEFIELD, CT 06877 (US) -TRANSFER TO- TRITON THALASSIC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.#241 ETHAN ALLEN HIGHWAY#RIDGEFIELD, CT 06877 (US)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2006-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238761 T3

2005-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-05-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829004 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE