Global Patent Index - EP 1082782 A1

EP 1082782 A1 2001-03-14 - DUAL POLARISED MULTI-RANGE ANTENNA

Title (en)

DUAL POLARISED MULTI-RANGE ANTENNA

Title (de)

DUAL POLARISIERTE MEHRBEREICHSANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE MULTIGAMME A POLARISATION DOUBLE

Publication

EP 1082782 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953403 A

Priority

  • DE 19823749 A
  • EP 9903484 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823749A1] The invention relates to an improved dual polarised multi-range antenna, comprising a first and a second radiation module (1, 3) for transmitting or receiving a first frequency band and a second frequency band offset from the first. Said dual polarised multi-range antenna is characterised by the following: seen from above the antenna, the second, additional, radiation module (3) provided for the upper frequency range is located inside the dipole square of the first radiation module (1); the second radiation module (3) consists of dipolar elements (3a) which are oriented orthogonally in relation to each other; the dipolar elements (3a) of the second radiation module (3) are parallel or vertical in relation to the dipolar elements (1a) of the first radiation module (1), forming a dipole square; and the ratio of the middle frequency of the upper frequency band to that of the lower frequency band is between 1,5 and 4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/29; H01Q 21/10; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 21/26; H01Q 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 5/42 (2015.01); H01Q 21/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/26 (2006.01); H01Q 21/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/29 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 5/42 (2013.01); H01Q 21/10 (2013.01); H01Q 21/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823749 A1 19991209; DE 19823749 C2 20020711; AU 4265199 A 19991213; AU 755335 B2 20021212; BR 9911595 A 20010213; BR 9911595 B1 20130716; CA 2331681 A1 19991202; CA 2331681 C 20030415; CN 1270409 C 20060816; CN 1303528 A 20010711; EP 1082782 A1 20010314; EP 1082782 B1 20030716; ES 2203196 T3 20040401; HK 1038280 A1 20070119; KR 100466960 B1 20050124; NZ 506976 A 20020828; US 6333720 B1 20011225; WO 9962139 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170520

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170520

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130520

2014-02-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-05-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060520

2005-05-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203196 T3

2003-10-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RUTZ, ISLER & PARTNER

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906301 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOETTL, MAXIMILIAN

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GABRIEL, ROLAND

2003-07-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLINGER, GEORG

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI SE