Global Patent Index - EP 1082784 A1

EP 1082784 A1 2001-03-14 - HF CONNECTOR WITH CUTTING EDGES

Title (en)

HF CONNECTOR WITH CUTTING EDGES

Title (de)

HF-STECKVERBINDER MIT VERSETZTEN SCHNEIDEN

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A FICHES H.F. A TRANCHANTS DECALES

Publication

EP 1082784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924693 A

Priority

  • DE 9900918 W
  • DE 19823957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823957A1] The invention relates to a connector for HF lines for contacting the outer conductor (8) of the HF line (3) by means of an insulation displacement connector having at least one pair of opposite cutting edges (2), whereby the opposite cutting edges (2) are staggered in the longitudinal axial direction of the outer conductor (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/245 (2013.01); H01R 9/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962141A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823957 A1 19991209; EP 1082784 A1 20010314; EP 1082784 B1 20030611; JP 2002517074 A 20020611; US 6837735 B1 20050104; WO 9962141 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905934

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100325

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905934 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT