Global Patent Index - EP 1082786 A1

EP 1082786 A1 2001-03-14 - PRINTED-BOARD GROUND CONNECTOR

Title (en)

PRINTED-BOARD GROUND CONNECTOR

Title (de)

LEITERPLATTEN-NULLKRAFTSTECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A FICHES MIS A LA TERRE POUR CARTES DE CIRCUITS

Publication

EP 1082786 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915514 A

Priority

  • DE 9900773 W
  • DE 19823684 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962149A1] The invention relates to a printed-board ground connector having an actuating member serving to move the connector from a mounted position to a connected position and vice versa. The connector is characterized in that the actuating member has a changeable shape, whereby its actual shape depends on the position of the actuating member in relation to the printed-board ground conductor that is to be actuated therewith and/or the position of the printed-board in relation to the printed-board ground connector and/or a blocking member is provided that can be moved by displacing the actuating member between a recess provided in the actuating member and a recess provided in the printed-board.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/85 (2011.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62988 (2013.01); H01R 12/85 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 13/62905 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962149A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962149 A1 19991202; EP 1082786 A1 20010314; EP 1082786 B1 20040512

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-05-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-11-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909475 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB