Global Patent Index - EP 1082920 A3

EP 1082920 A3 2002-09-25 - Decorative chain with angularly offset links

Title (en)

Decorative chain with angularly offset links

Title (de)

Schmuckkette mit im Winckel versetzt angeordneten Gliedern

Title (fr)

Chaîne ornementale à maillons décalés angulairement

Publication

EP 1082920 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00830603 A

Priority

IT FI990186 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1082920A2] The links are joined in a manner similar to that used in so-called Venetian chains, but each link: is rectangular, with the width of the thin strip smaller than the short side of the strip forming the link; is joined to two links lying one after the other on either side of the concatenation; and in the concatenation the links are angularly orientated - about the axis of the extended chain - at angles of approximately 60 DEG relative to one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 530419 A 19401211 - FRITZ DISTEL, et al
  • [X] "LES TYPES DE CHAINES", LA FRANCE HORLOGERE, SOCIETE MILLOT ET CIE. BESANCON, FR, no. 513, 1 May 1990 (1990-05-01), pages 100 - 102,105-106, XP000126218, ISSN: 0015-9573

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1082920 A2 20010314; EP 1082920 A3 20020925; IT 1307794 B1 20011119; IT FI990186 A1 20010309; IT FI990186 D0 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI