Global Patent Index - EP 1082928 A1

EP 1082928 A1 2001-03-14 - Duvet cover

Title (en)

Duvet cover

Title (de)

Deckbettbezug

Title (fr)

Housse de couette

Publication

EP 1082928 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00203215 A

Priority

NL 1013015 A

Abstract (en)

The duvet cover comprises a sleeve of material with a section (13) into which the duvet fits and which fastens it to the cover. A tuck-in section (14) at the end is fastened under the duvet or can be used to fit over a longer duvet.

Abstract (de)

Deckbettbezug, umfassend eine Hülle von Stoff die das Deckbett wenigstens im Wesentlichen völlig umgibt u. gegen Schmutz beschirmt, wobei der Bezug versehen ist von leicht los zu machenden Verbindungsmitteln womit der Bezug derartig geöffnet werden kann, daß das darin Anbringen des Deckbettes erleichtert wird; von Einsteckmitteln (13) worin ein Randteil d. Deckbettes aufgenommen werden kann um dieses an den Bezug zu fixieren; und von einem Einschlagstreifen (14) an seinem Unterende um den Bezug festzuklemmen bezügl. des Bettes, wobei der Einschlagstreifen so ausgeführt ist, daß das auch ein längeres Deckbett darin durchlaufen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/0261 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2272639 A 19940525 - BRINTON VALERIE [GB]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1082928 A1 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030604

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI