Global Patent Index - EP 1082929 A2

EP 1082929 A2 2001-03-14 - Sliding rail device

Title (en)

Sliding rail device

Title (de)

Gleitschieneneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de glissière

Publication

EP 1082929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124700 A

Priority

DE 29915748 U

Abstract (en)

The unit (10) consists of at least two parallel slide rails (11,12) which are spaced horizontally. Several rod-like wall or ceiling holders (20) are also provided which are each attached at one end to the wall or ceiling and at the other end to the slide rails. Curtain holders (30) are also provided which have a moveable shaft which moves in the gap between the slide rails and is held there due to it having a head (31) which is wider than the gap.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Gleitschieneneinrichtung (10) zur Wand- und/oder Deckenhalterung von Gardinen/Vorhängen angegeben, bei der wenigstens zwei parallel Gleitschienen (11, 12) mit horizontalem Abstand angeordnet sind und mehrere stabförmige Wand- bzw. Deckenhalter (20) die Gleitschienen (11, 12) auf ihrer Oberseite umschließen und im Abstand halten, wobei die Wand- bzw. Deckenhalter (20) eine zur Gardine/ Vorhang gerichtete Öffnung (28) aufweisen, durch die der Kopf (31) von Gardienen/Vorhangträgern (30) hindurchpasst. Dadurch können Gardinen/Vorhänge ohne Behinderung durch die Halter über eine beliebige Länge und Bahnform verschoben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/04 (2006.01); A47H 1/124 (2006.01); A47H 13/00 (2006.01); A47H 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/04 (2013.01); A47H 1/124 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01); A47H 15/04 (2013.01); A47H 2001/042 (2013.01); A47H 2001/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915748 U1 19991223; EP 1082929 A2 20010314; EP 1082929 A3 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47H 1/04 A, 7A 47H 1/124 B, 7A 47H 13/00 B, 7A 47H 15/04 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI