Global patent index - EP 1082935 A1

EP 1082935 A1 2001-03-14 - Folding screen

Title (en)

Folding screen

Title (de)

Schirmwand

Title (fr)

Paravent

Publication

EP 1082935 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119225 A

Priority

DE 19942771 A

Abstract (en)

The method for manufacturing a screen comprises forming tubular pockets (32) across the width and/or length of a strip of material. Supporting rods (9) are then fitted into the pockets. An Independent claim is included for a screen manufactured as described above.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schirmwand, die aus einer Stofffläche besteht, die durch Versteifungsstäbe gespannt wird, sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Schirmwand. In eine Stoffbahn werden während ihrer Herstellung über die Breite und/oder Länge schlauchartige Taschen eingearbeitet, die die Fläche der Schirmwand definieren. Die so eingegrenzte Fläche der Stoffbahn wird aus dieser herausgetrennt. In die schlauchartigen Taschen, die Ränder dieser Flächen bilden, werden Versteifungsstäbe eingeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/38; A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); A47K 3/38 (2006.01); E04H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/003 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); A47K 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 1082935 A1 20010314; EP 1082935 B1 20070228; AT 355005 T 20060315; DE 19942771 A1 20010315; DE 50014108 D1 20070412; ES 2280164 T3 20070916

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071129

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2280164

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040706

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI