Global Patent Index - EP 1082977 A1

EP 1082977 A1 2001-03-14 - Ski, or other gliding board having rigid and distinct sidewalls and method of making the same

Title (en)

Ski, or other gliding board having rigid and distinct sidewalls and method of making the same

Title (de)

Ski, oder andere Gleitbretter mit verstärkten und separaten Seitenwangen und dazugehöriges Verfahren

Title (fr)

Ski, ou autre planche de glisse sur neige, comportant des chants latéraux rigides et distincts et procédé de réalisation de tels chants

Publication

EP 1082977 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420182 A

Priority

FR 9911488 A

Abstract (en)

A ski, etc has two longitudinal side faces formed by discrete rigid elements that include non-corrodible metallic particles. Independent claims are included for the following: (a) Forming an element for use as above by adding metallic particles to a polymer and extruding the mixture. (b) Forming an element for use as above by repeatedly building up on a sheet of thin paper first a layer of thermally curable resin and then a layer of metallic particles. The stacked layers are compressed and released after the resin has cured. The cured stack is cut into lengths. Preferred Features: The particles are flakes 5-100 micro,m in length or balls of about 100 micro,m diameter.

Abstract (fr)

Un ski, ou une autre planche de glisse sur neige, présente les deux bords latéraux et longitudinaux qui sont constitués par des éléments en longerons rigides distincts (6, 7) appelés « chants ». Ces chants (6, 7) comportent, incorporées et réparties dans leur structure, une multitude d'inclusions métalliques discrètes (11), en métal inaltérable à la corrosion et d'aspect brillant. Ces chants sont réalisés en matériaux polymères thermodurcissables ou thermoplastiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2013.01); A63C 5/0434 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1082977 A1 20010314; EP 1082977 B1 20050914; AT 304394 T 20050915; DE 60022596 D1 20051020; DE 60022596 T2 20060622; FR 2798297 A1 20010316; FR 2798297 B1 20011116; US 6402182 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60022596

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080829

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022596 P 20051020

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-12-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI