Global Patent Index - EP 1083028 A2

EP 1083028 A2 2001-03-14 - Dressing apparatus

Title (en)

Dressing apparatus

Title (de)

Abrichtvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dressage

Publication

EP 1083028 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119573 A

Priority

DE 19942732 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) has a planing tool (54), which is held in the front of a planing head (10). The planing head has two cooling channels (25) and two cooling nozzles (45), which area arranged next to two opposite sides of the planing tool. The planing device also has a distributor device (30) with at least one supply for the cooling channels and at least one coolant connection (38,46) for the coolant supply. Independent claims are included for a planing head for use in the device and for a method to cool the planing tool of the device.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Abrichtvorrichtung (1) mit einem Abrichtwerkzeug (54), welches mittels eines Werkzeughalters (50) in der Vorderseite eines Abrichtkopfes (10) befestigt ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß der Abrichtkopf (10) zwei Kühlkanäle (25, 26) und zwei damit verbundene Kühldüsen (25a, 26a) aufweist, wobei die Kühldüsen (25a, 26a) neben zwei einander gegenüberliegenden Seiten des Abrichtwerkzeugs (54) angeordnet sind und daß die Abrichtvorrichtung (1) ferner eine Verteilereinrichtung (30) mit mindestens einer mit den Kühlkanälen (25, 26) des Abrichtkopfes (10) verbundenen Kühlmittelzuführung (36, 37) und mindestens einem mit der Kühlmittelzuführung (36, 37) verbundenen Kühlmittelanschluß (38) aufweist. Vorzugsweise ist eine weitere Verteilervorrichtung (4) mit einer dritten Kühldüse (45) oberhalb des Abrichtwerkzeugs (54) vorgesehen. Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zur Kühlung eines Abrichtwerkzeugs (54) in einer Abrichtvorrichtung (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 53/12; B24B 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/095 (2006.01); B24B 53/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/095 (2013.01); B24B 53/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083028 A2 20010314; EP 1083028 A3 20030917; DE 19942732 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI