Global Patent Index - EP 1083059 A1

EP 1083059 A1 2001-03-14 - Device for binding with thread continuously fed printed products

Title (en)

Device for binding with thread continuously fed printed products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fadensiegeln von kontinuierlich gefördertem Heftgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour relier au fil du matériau imprimé alimenté continuellement

Publication

EP 1083059 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117893 A

Priority

EP 99117893 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a rotating thread disc (2) with thread holding sections (10) and pairs of openings for needle pairs (11), to form a stitch, where the needle pair movement is radially and time-controlled. A unit to take the stitching force is arranged at the edge of the thread disc on the other side of the web. A stitching unit (16) in the thread disc rotation direction fits the disc edge. A transport organ holds and transports the web about the thread disc from supply to delivery units. The transport organ has two band guide drums (3) coaxial to and spaced from the thread disc, with a diameter and rotation speed corresponding to that of the thread disc, and two transport bands (12), which are guided by guide rollers (17,17',21) and driven so that they form a holder wedge (33) and rotate the web through an angle of 120 degrees -240 degrees and transport the web without slipping. The unit to take the stitching force has a toothed belt with an opening or space and runs about guide rollers, of which one is synchronous with the thread disc, where the opening or space is aligned with the spaces in the thread disc. A feed unit for the web has a clock unit (55), which is assigned to a sensor (8) and a control unit. The clock unit controls the web feed, so that the holder wedge between the bands and the thread disc or the band guide drums is such that the thread holder section (10) is exactly positioned.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung hat eine von einer Welle (1) angetriebene Fadenscheibe (2), auf deren Umfang Fadenaufnahmeabschnitte (10) mit gleicher Teilung angeordnet sind. Im Abstand von jeder Stirnseite der Fadenscheibe (2) ist eine ebenfalls von der Welle (1) angetriebene Bandführungstrommel (3) vorgesehen, deren Durchmesser dem der Fadenscheibe (2) entspricht. Der Bandführungsrolle (3) ist ein um Umlenkrollen (17, 17', 21) geführtes Transportband (12) so zugeordnet, daß es die Bandführungstrommel (3) zwischen einem Aufnahmekeil (33) für das Heftgut und einer Abführeinrichtung (17, 19) auf einem Winkel von etwa 180° umschließt. Diesem Heftguttransportbereich, in welchem das Heftgut zwischen den Transportbändern und den Bandführungstrommeln (3) fest eingespannt transportiert wird, sind in Drehrichtung der Fadenscheibe aufeinanderfolgend eine Fadenklammerbildungsstelle (56), an der ein in der Fadenscheibe radial bewegliches Nadelpaar (11) das Heftgut zur Bildung einer Fadenklammer durchsticht, und eine Siegeleinrichtung (16) zur Siegelung der Fadenklammer angeordnet, wobei vor der Fadenklammerbildungsstelle eine Vorstecheinrichtung (13) vorgesehen werden kann. Vor dem Aufnahmekeil ist eine Takteinrichtung (55) angeordnet, die dafür sorgt, daß das taktfrei zugeführte Heftgut der Fadenscheibe (2) synchron zu ihrem Arbeitstakt zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 5/00; B42B 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 2/00 (2006.01); B42B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/00 (2013.01); B42B 2/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 29510607 U1 19950907 - BREHMER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINEN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083059 A1 20010314; EP 1083059 B1 20031203; DE 59907946 D1 20040115

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907946

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907946 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCHINENBAU OPPENWEILERBINDER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI