Global Patent Index - EP 1083106 A1

EP 1083106 A1 2001-03-14 - Vehicle for measuring the geometric condition of a railway track

Title (en)

Vehicle for measuring the geometric condition of a railway track

Title (de)

Fahrzeug zur Vermessung des geometrischen Zustandes eines Gleises

Title (fr)

Véhicule de mesure de l'état géometrique d'une voie ferrée.

Publication

EP 1083106 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00810805 A

Priority

FR 9911302 A

Abstract (en)

The gauging vehicle for railways (V) has a rigid chassis forming the measuring base, supported on bogies (10-12). The chassis has opto-electronic sensors to measure the elastic deformations of the chassis (9) during their movement along the rails. The chassis deformation values are fed to controls for correcting the revised geometric configuration.

Abstract (fr)

Le véhicule (V) permet de mesurer l'état géométrique d'une voie ferrée par rapport à sa configuration théorique. Il comprend un châssis rigide (9) constituant la base de mesure supporté par des moyens de roulement (10, 11, 12) et des moyens agencés (13, 14, 15) pour relever la configuration géométrique. Des moyens d'exploitation permettent de déterminer la dégradation de la configuration géométrique relevée. Le châssis (9) est muni de moyens optoélectroniques (21, 22, 23, 24, N) agencés pour mesurer les déformations élastiques du châssis (9) lors de son déplacement sur la voie (R). Les valeurs de déformation du châssis (9) sont fournies aux moyens d'exploitation pour corriger les valeurs de la configuration géométrique relevée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 35/04 (2006.01); B61K 9/08 (2006.01); G01B 11/16 (2006.01); G01B 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083106 A1 20010314; EP 1083106 B1 20041027; DE 60015268 D1 20041202; DE 60015268 T2 20051103; FR 2798347 A1 20010316; FR 2798347 B1 20011130; JP 2001114104 A 20010424; US 6415522 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150907

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150907

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120907

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60015268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60015268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI