Global Patent Index - EP 1083127 A2

EP 1083127 A2 2001-03-14 - Supporting frame for holding bags

Title (en)

Supporting frame for holding bags

Title (de)

Traggestell zum Einhängen von Säcken

Title (fr)

Cadre de support pour la suspension de sacs

Publication

EP 1083127 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106788 A

Priority

DE 29915072 U

Abstract (en)

The carrier unit for suspension of sacks incorporates at least one lever type, pivotably mounted sack holding clamp (22) whose end (23) is shaped as a handle. The other end (24) of the clamp takes the form of clamping jaw (25) which - for purposes of clamping a part of the sack rim - is pressed against a spring strip (16) by means of the rotation spring (26).

Abstract (de)

Ein sicheres Halten und Einhängen von Säcken mit einem Tragteil aus zwei in waagerechter Ebene gegeneinander federnden und an ihren Enden gelenkig miteinander verbundenen Leisten (14, 16), über die der Sackrand kragenförmig umgeschlagen wird, wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch erzielt, daß mindestens eine hebelartig ausgebildete, schwenkbar gelagerte Sackhalteklammer (22) vorgesehen ist, die an einem Ende (23) als Griffteil ausgebildet ist und an dem anderen Ende (24) eine Klemmbacke (25) aufweist, welche durch eine die Sackhalteklammer (22) beaufschlagende Drehfeder (26) zur Klemmung eines Teiles des Sackrandes preßbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 67/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 67/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 67/1233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915072 U1 19991028; DE 50012036 D1 20060406; EP 1083127 A2 20010314; EP 1083127 A3 20021009; EP 1083127 B1 20060111

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160303

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012036

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2006-01-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI