Global Patent Index - EP 1083138 A2

EP 1083138 A2 2001-03-14 - Device for separating empty bags

Title (en)

Device for separating empty bags

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Vereinzelung von Leersäcken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des sacs vides

Publication

EP 1083138 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890269 A

Priority

AT 154399 A

Abstract (en)

The device for removing individual sacks (5) from a stack (2) and feeding them to a filling position comprises a conveyor belt (3) with suction equipment between the belt surfaces so that the sack is held on to the belt. The novelty is that the belt and suction equipment are mounted so that the belt can operate in a vertical or horizontal position.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abnehmen eines einseitig offenen Sackes (5) von einem Stapel (2) solcher Säcke, welche vorzugsweise in einem Sackmagazin (1) aufbewahrt sind, mittels einer Heb- und Ansaugvorrichtung und zum Weiterbefördern des Sackes (5) in eine Weiterverarbeitungsposition. Um eine hohe Durchsatzleistung der zu vereinzelten Säcke zu ermöglichen, sowie eine variabel an die Systemanforderungen anpassbare wahlweise horizontale, vertikale oder dazwischenliegende Weiterverarbeitungsposition realisierbar zu machen, ist vorgesehen, dass die Heb- und Ansaugvorrichtung horizontal und vertikal beweglich gelagert ist, um das Abnehmen und Weiterbefördern des Sackes (5) zu beschleunigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/18 (2006.01); B65G 15/58 (2006.01); B65G 59/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/128 (2013.01); B65H 2403/5311 (2013.01); B65H 2701/191 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083138 A2 20010314; EP 1083138 A3 20020821; AT 411990 B 20040826; AT A154399 A 20040115; JP 2001097315 A 20010410; US 6318052 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI