Global Patent Index - EP 1083141 A2

EP 1083141 A2 2001-03-14 - Hydraulic elevator with easier maintenance of the hydraulic driving unit

Title (en)

Hydraulic elevator with easier maintenance of the hydraulic driving unit

Title (de)

Hydraulikaufzug mit wartungsgünstiger Hydraulikantriebeinheit

Title (fr)

Ascenseur hydraulique avec maintenance simplifiée sur l'unité d'entraînement hydraulique

Publication

EP 1083141 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119579 A

Priority

DE 19943408 A

Abstract (en)

The lift has a cabin (2) connected to a hoisting cable (8) in a conveying area and a hydraulic drive unit (4) arranged in a lower area of the conveying area. The hydraulic drive unit has a cylinder and piston (18) arrangement, a hydraulic pump (14) and a valve arrangement (16). The piston and a hydraulic fluid reservoir are arranged in a common casing (12). The hydraulic pump and the valve arrangement are arranged above the casing. The cylinder and piston arrangement is fitted in the conveying area, so that the area of the cylinder and piston arrangement with the hydraulic pump and valve arrangement is on top of the lift cabin, when it is at its lowest position in the lift shaft. An Independent claim is included for a hydraulic drive unit for use with the lift.

Abstract (de)

Hydraulikaufzug, aufweisend eine an einem Förderseil (8) angeschlossene Aufzugskabine (2) in einem Aufzugs-Förderbereich und eine im unteren Bereich des Aufzugs-Förderbereichs vorgesehene Hydraulikantriebseinheit (4) mit einer Zylinder/Kolbenanordnung (42/18), einer Hydraulikpumpe (14) und einer Ventilanordnung (16), wobei der Druckzylinder (18) und ein Hydraulikflüssigkeitsbehälter der Hydraulikantriebseinheit (4) in einem gemeinsamen Gehäuse (12) vorgesehen sind, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Hydraulikpumpe (14) und die Ventilanordnung (16) im wesentlichen oben auf dem Gehäuse (12) der Zylinder/Kolbenanordnung (42/18)angebracht sind, und daß die Zylinder/Kolbenanordnung (42/18) derart in dem Aufzugs-Förderbereich angebracht ist, daß sich der Bereich der Zylinder/Kolbenanordnung (42/18) mit Hydraulikpumpe (14) und Ventilanordnung (16) oberhalb der Aufzugskabine (2) befindet, wenn diese an ihrer tiefsten Position im Aufzugs-Förderbereich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083141 A2 20010314; EP 1083141 A3 20041215; DE 19943408 A1 20010322; DE 19943408 C2 20031204

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-10-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI