Global patent index - EP 1083142 A2

EP 1083142 A2 2001-03-14 - Lifting system on guiding rails and its protecting case

Title (en)

Lifting system on guiding rails and its protecting case

Title (de)

Schienengeführtes Liftsystem und dafür bestimmte Schutzgehäuse

Title (fr)

Système d'ascenseur sur rails de guidage et son boîtier de protection

Publication

EP 1083142 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119774 A

Priority

DE 19944902 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a transport frame (4) with a platform (6) or seat, and at least one drive unit for moving the transport frame along at least one rail (1) on a preselected transport path. A closed and/or closable protective housing (10) for accommodating the transport frame is arranged at one or more selected points along the transport path. An Independent claim is also included for a stop for rail or bus traffic.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein schienengeführtes Liftsystem zum Überwinden von Höhenunterschieden, insbesondere in öffentlichen Anlagen, beschrieben. Das Liftsystem enthält ein Fahrgestell (4), wenigstens eine zu dessen Führung bestimmte, längs einer vorgewählten Fahrbahn verlegte Fahrbahnschiene (1) und eine am Fahrgestell (4) montierte, zu dessen Fortbewegung bestimmte Antriebseinheit. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Liftsystem an wenigstens einer ausgewählten Stelle der Fahrbahn mit einem abschließbaren, zur Aufnahme des Fahrgestells (4) bestimmten, rundum geschlossenen und/oder schließbaren Schutzgehäuse (1) versehen <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/0853 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083142 A2 20010314; EP 1083142 A3 20020710; DE 19944902 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050309

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI