Global patent index - EP 1083215 A1

EP 1083215 A1 2001-03-14 - Detergent

Title (en)

Detergent

Title (de)

Waschmittel

Title (fr)

Composition détergente

Publication

EP 1083215 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00118648 A

Priority

DE 19942538 A

Abstract (en)

Non-enzymatic proteins and/or their derivatives are used as restoring agents in detergents which also contain surfactants and zeolite builders. A detergent comprises : (A) anionic, nonionic and/or amphoteric surfactants; (B) non-enzymatic proteins and/or derivatives; and (C) zeolites.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen werden Waschmittel, enthaltend (a) anionische, nichtionische und/oder amphotere Tenside, (b) nicht-enzymatische Proteine und/oder deren Derivate, und (c) Zeolithe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 1/37; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/382; C11D 3/384

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/86 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19942538 A1 20010308; EP 1083215 A1 20010314

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030812

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000829

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI