Global Patent Index - EP 1083216 A2

EP 1083216 A2 2001-03-14 - Cogranulates comprising layered alkali metal silicates and disintegrants

Title (en)

Cogranulates comprising layered alkali metal silicates and disintegrants

Title (de)

Cogranulate aus Alkalischichtsilikaten und Sprengmitteln

Title (fr)

Cogranulés comprenant de silicates de métaux alkalins en couche et de désintégrants

Publication

EP 1083216 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118915 A

Priority

DE 19943237 A

Abstract (en)

Cogranulates containing foliated alkali silicates and disintegration agent are claimed. Independent claims are also included for: (a) the production of the cogranulates by mixing these materials, consolidation by press granulation and milling and sifting; and (b) laundry and other detergent tablets containing a cogranulate of this type.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Cogranulate aus Schichtsilikaten und Sprengmitteln, insbesondere Cellulose sowie Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel, die diese Cogranulate, bevorzugt in Tablettenform, enthalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 3/22; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083216 A2 20010314; EP 1083216 A3 20030122; DE 19943237 A1 20010517; JP 2001089791 A 20010403; KR 20010050392 A 20010615; US 6506722 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051023

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI