Global Patent Index - EP 1083254 A2

EP 1083254 A2 2001-03-14 - Method of making a pull cord for blinds

Title (en)

Method of making a pull cord for blinds

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zugschnur für Jalousien

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un cordon de tirage pour jalousies

Publication

EP 1083254 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307726 A

Priority

US 15282499 P

Abstract (en)

A method of manufacturing a control cord for use in a covering for architectural openings includes the steps of providing spools of high tensile strength and low abrasion characteristic yarns, tensioning the yarns and winding the yarns under tension on bobbins, placing the bobbins in a braiding apparatus and making an eight-carrier braid from the yarns on the bobbins, and passing the braided cord through a treatment apparatus where a urethane coating is applied to the yarns and heat cured. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04C 1/12; D07B 5/00; D07B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 1/12 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01); D07B 5/00 (2006.01); D07B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 7/145 (2013.01); D04C 1/12 (2013.01); D07B 1/02 (2013.01); D07B 1/16 (2013.01); D07B 1/162 (2013.01); D07B 5/00 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1096 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2087 (2013.01); D07B 2205/2064 (2013.01); D07B 2207/404 (2013.01); D07B 2501/2084 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

D07B 2205/2064 + D07B 2801/22

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083254 A2 20010314; EP 1083254 A3 20021113; AU 5656500 A 20010308; AU 768863 B2 20040108; US 2002104626 A1 20020808

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060325

2005-11-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MAKING A PULL CORD FOR BLINDS

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI