Global Patent Index - EP 1083256 A2

EP 1083256 A2 2001-03-14 - Washing machine

Title (en)

Washing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Waschen von Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Machine à laver le linge

Publication

EP 1083256 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118916 A

Priority

DE 19943495 A

Abstract (en)

The drum washing machine has a rotary washing drum (11) with a cylindrical mantle supported for rotation relative to the frame of the washing machine by a number of oscillation mountings (24), each provided with a pair of spaced rollers (22,23) engaging the cylindrical mantle and pivoted about an axis (32) which is parallel to the drum axis.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtungen zum Waschen von Wäschestücken (Durchlaufwaschmaschinen 10) weisen eine drehbare Trommel (11) zum Waschen der Wäschestücke auf. Die Trommel (11) ist auf Laufrädern (22, 23) gelagert, die an einem Gestell (25) befestigt sind. Zur zuverlässigen Lagerung der Trommel (11) müssen gegenüberliegenden Endbereichen derselben mehr als zwei Laufräder (22, 23) zugeordnet werden. Die Folge ist eine statisch überbestimmte Lagerung der Trommel (11), wodurch die Laufräder (22, 23) unterschiedlich belastet werden. Außerdem führt ein Schaden an einem Laufrad (22, 23) bei bekannten Durchlaufwaschmaschinen (10) dazu, dass diese außer Betrieb gesetzt werden muss. Bei der erfindungsgemäßen Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) sind Gruppen aus mindestens zwei Laufrädern (22, 23) jeweils einer Schwinge (24) zugeordnet, die schwenkbar am Gestell (25) gelagert ist. Durch die verschwenkbaren Schwingen (24) werden die daran angeordneten Laufräder (22, 23) gleichmäßig belastet, so dass vier oder auch mehrere Laufräder (22, 23) jedem Endbereich der Trommel (11) ohne eine statische Überbestimmung zugeordnet werden können. Außerdem kann bei einem Schaden an einem Laufrad (22, 23) durch ein Arretieren der betreffenden Schwingen (24) das defekte Laufrad außer Kontakt mit der Trommel (11) gebracht und während des Betriebs der Durchlaufwaschmaschine (10) repariert oder ausgetauscht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 31/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083256 A2 20010314; EP 1083256 A3 20030910; EP 1083256 B1 20051123; DE 19943495 A1 20010315; DE 50011674 D1 20051229; ES 2253165 T3 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-10-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20141009

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERBERT KANNEGIESSER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50011674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-05-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20130405

2013-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121004

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2253165

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060307

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7D 06F 31/00 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16C 13/04 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI