Global Patent Index - EP 1083259 A3

EP 1083259 A3 2001-05-09 - Headbox

Title (en)

Headbox

Title (de)

Stoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1083259 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00116670 A

Priority

DE 19937302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19937302A1] The stock inlet for a papermaking machine has a turbulence insert with a number of channels (5) to carry the fiber suspension. They have hydraulic diameters which expand from the penultimate diameter (D2) to the final diameter (D1). The start point of the final expansion is at a gap (L1) from the end of the turbulence insert. The turbulence insert meets the conditions: L1/D1=a asterisk expb asterisk D1/D2 where; a = 10.252; and b = 0.457. The maxim permissible deviation of the L1/D1 value is from ?+30% to ?-60% and preferably from ?+20% to ?-20%. The suspension flow speed at the cross section of the final hydraulic diameter (D1) of the turbulence channel (5) is set at a rate (VL) of 0.5-5.0 m/sec., and preferably 0.8-3.0 m/sec., and especially preferably 1.0-2.5 m/sec. The suspension concentration (k), for the stock inlet operation, is 5-25 g/l and preferably 7-20 g/l and especially preferably 7-15 g/l. The suspension flow speed at the start of the final expansion (7) and the end of the turbulence insert has a mean speed level (VL) where the turbulence insert meets the conditions: L1/D1=a asterisk expb asterisk D1/D2 asterisk (VL(m/s)/c)<3/4> where; a = 10.252; b = 0.457; and c = 2.2 (m/s). The maxim permissible deviation of the L1/D1 value is from ?+30% to ?-60% and preferably ?+20% to ?-40% and especially from ?+10% to ?-20%. The suspension flow through the turbulence insert has a mean concentration k (g/l) where the turbulence insert meets the conditions: L1/D1=a asterisk expb asterisk D1/D2 asterisk (d/k(g/l))<1/2> where; a = 10.252; b = 0.457; and d = 5 (g/l). The maxim permissible deviation of the L1/D1 value is from ?+30% to ?-60% and preferably ?+20% to ?-40% and especially preferably ?+10% to ?-20%. With a mean suspension concentration k (g/l) and an average flow speed VL between the start of the final expansion (7) and the end of the turbulence insert, the turbulence insert meets the conditions: L1/D1=a asterisk expb asterisk D1/D2 asterisk (VL(m/s)/c)<3/4> asterisk (d/k(g/l))<1/2> where; a = 10.252; b = 0.457; c = 2.2 (m/s); and d = 5(g/l). The maxim permissible deviation of the L1/D1 value is from ?+30% to ?-60% and preferably ?+20% to ?-40% and especially preferably ?+10% to ?-20%. The free cross section of the turbulence channels (5) at least at the end section is quadratic, rectangular, circular, hexagonal, or lozenge-shaped. The free cross section at the entry into the turbulence channels (5) is circular. The turbulence channels (5) have a double expansion. At least one expansion (6,7) in at least one channel (5) has an abrupt step structure, or is conical. At least one expansion (6,7) in at least one turbulence channel (5) has a transit between two cross section shapes of the turbulence channel (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/026 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4310223 A1 19941006 - ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19937302 A1 20010215; EP 1083259 A2 20010314; EP 1083259 A3 20010509; EP 1083259 B1 20041103

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008486

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140802

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008486

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-02-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008486 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI