Global Patent Index - EP 1083260 A2

EP 1083260 A2 2001-03-14 - Twin wire former

Title (en)

Twin wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 1083260 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116688 A

Priority

DE 19943369 A

Abstract (en)

The double fourdrinier section (10), of a papermaking or cardboard prodn. machine, has two continuous fourdriniers (14,16) which form an entry gap (18) between them for the pulp feed from the stock inlet (23) to be converted into a web (12). An applicator (26) to deliver a filling suspension is on both sides of the double-fourdrinier stretch (24), after the entry gap (18) between them, with facing suction units (28,32,34). The fourdriniers are aligned on the vertical (V) or at an angle ( alpha ) to the vertical of (-) 30 degrees to (+) 30 degrees and especially (-) 20 degrees to (+) 20 degrees and pref. (-) 5 degrees to (+) 5 degrees on both sides of the double fourdrinier path. The filling suspension is composed of water with a filling material of kaolin, clay, CaCO3 as ground GCC or precipitated PCC, zeolite, TiO2, bentonite and/or other mineral materials, singly or in combinations. The filling suspension additionally carries fine and fiber materials, retention agents and/or other auxiliary processing agents. At the entry gap (18) between the fourdriniers for the pulp feed, one fourdrinier (16) of the pair (14,16) passes around a web shaping suction roller (22) before they come together in a vertical double-fourdrinier stretch (24) for the web formation zone (32). The web formation zone has at least one web development shoe (32) in a number of zone sections and especially 1-4 and pref. 1-3 sections (32'.32,32'). Where the pulp is converted into a web (12), the action of the shoe (32) is augmented by facing bars (36). Further water is extracted from the wet web (12) by at least one flat suction unit (34) in the vertical double-fourdrinier stretch (24), after the shoe structure (32), followed by a suction roller (28) for additional water extraction. At least one applicator (26) for the filling suspension is on the opposite side of the double fourdrinier to the flat suction unit (34) and the opposite side to the shoe structure (32) and the opposite side to the suction roller (28). After the filling suspension has been delivered into the double-fourdrinier stretch with the wet web, the collected extracted water is separated for processing apart from the collected water before the addition of the filling suspension. The entry gap (18) for the pulp feed, between the fourdriniers, is under the vertical double-fourdrinier stretch (24).

Abstract (de)

Ein Doppelsiebformer 10 einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn 12 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt zwei umlaufende endlose Sieben 14, 16, die unter Bildung eines Stoffeinlaufspaltes 18 zusammenlaufen. Innerhalb einer sich an den Stoffeinlaufspalt 18 anschließenden Doppelsiebstrecke 24, die genau vertikal oder unter einem Winkel zur Vertikalen V verläuft, wobei dieser Winkel zweckmäßigerweise in einem Bereich von etwa -30° bis etwa +30°, insbesondere in einem Bereich von etwa -20° bis etwa +20° und vorzugsweise in einem Bereich von etwa -5° bis etwa +5° liegt, auf beiden Doppelsiebseiten jeweils wenigstens ein Applikator 26 zum Auftragen einer Füllstoffsuspension vorgesehen. Vorzugsweise liegt jeder Applikator 26 jeweils einem auf der anderen Doppelsiebseite vorgesehenen Saugerelement 28, 32, 34 gegenüber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083260 A2 20010314; EP 1083260 A3 20010711; EP 1083260 B1 20041103; AT 281556 T 20041115; DE 19943369 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008487

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120803

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 281556 T

- Effective date: 20120802

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-02-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008487 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2004-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI IT SE

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020111

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI