Global Patent Index - EP 1083262 A2

EP 1083262 A2 2001-03-14 - Method for loading and unloading a vehicle of a transport train and vehicle therefor

Title (en)

Method for loading and unloading a vehicle of a transport train and vehicle therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Be- und Entladen eines Verladewagens eines Transportzuges sowie Verladewagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de chargement et de déchargement d'un véhicule d'un train de transport et véhicule à cet effet

Publication

EP 1083262 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890242 A

Priority

AT 155499 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves assigning each transport wagon (1) with a base conveyor belt (7) moving in the longitudinal direction and a spaced overburden conveying belt (15) connected by a transfer conveyor belt projecting over one end of the wagon. The overburden is transported directly behind a rear end of the wagon to be loaded onto the transfer conveyor belt of the adjacent wagon. The transfer conveyor belt leads directly to the base conveyor belt of the wagon to be loaded. An Independent claim is included for a transport wagon for use in the method.

Abstract (de)

Jedem Verladewagen (1) eines Transportzuges (14) ist ein zum Transport von Schüttgut in Wagenlängsrichtung bewegbares Bodenförderband (7) und ein an dieses anschließendes, über ein Wagenende vorkragendes Übergabeförderband (10) sowie ein zum Transport in Wagenlängsrichtung bewegbares und vom Bodenförderband (7) distanziertes Abraumförderband (15) zugeordnet. Auf den Abraumförderbändern (15) in einer Abraum-Transportrichtung (17) transportierter Abraum (16) wird unmittelbar hinter einem hinteren Ende des zu beladenden Verladewagens (1) auf das Übergabeförderband (10) des unmittelbar nachfolgenden bzw. angrenzenden Verladewagens (1) abgeworfen. In weiterer Folge wird der Abraum (16) vom genannten Übergabeförderband (10) auf das Bodenförderband (7) des zu beladenden Verladewagens (1) weitergegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 5/00 (2006.01); B61D 3/00 (2006.01); B61D 47/00 (2006.01); B65G 67/00 (2006.01); B65G 67/08 (2006.01); B65G 67/10 (2006.01); B65G 67/24 (2006.01); E01B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/00 (2013.01); E01B 2203/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083262 A2 20010314; EP 1083262 A3 20010801; CN 1287962 A 20010321; JP 2001130750 A 20010515; PL 342460 A1 20010312; RU 2186017 C2 20020727; UA 69401 C2 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020202

2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01B 27/04 A, 7E 01B 27/02 B, 7B 65G 67/10 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI